Brigg v. PFVT Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Karen Brigg
Defendant: PFVT Motors LLC and PFVT Motors LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Peoria Ford
Case Number: 2:2020cv00478
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Karen Brigg. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 6/5/20 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/15/20. (DXD)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PFVT Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Automotive for PFVT Motors LLC. (Curran, Christopher)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ignacio J Hiraldo on behalf of Plaintiff Karen Brigg. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to PFVT Motors LLC. (KFZ)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PFVT Motors LLC.(Curran, Christopher)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Karen Brigg: Return of Service re: Complaint upon PFVT Motors, LLC on 3/23/2020. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 4, 2020. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/4/20. (SLQ)
March 5, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Manuel Santiago Hiraldo on behalf of Plaintiff Karen Brigg. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PFVT Motors LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18035309. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-478-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Karen Brigg. (Hiraldo, Manuel) (ARC)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18035309 filed by Karen Brigg. (Hiraldo, Manuel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brigg v. PFVT Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Brigg
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Represented By: Ignacio J Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFVT Motors LLC
Represented By: Darrell Eugene Davis
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFVT Motors LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Peoria Ford
Represented By: Darrell Eugene Davis
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?