Mendoza v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Marisol Mendoza
Respondent: Paul M Habich, Chad Wolf, Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, William Barr and John W Davis
Case Number: 2:2020cv00514
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Alien Detainee - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY in Support of #19 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241), #26 MOTION (Application) for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B.)(WLP)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Exceed (Doc. #32 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the lodged proposed Reply (Doc. 33). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/21/2020. (WLP)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:(1) Petitioner's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #31 ) is granted. (2) The Clerk of Court shall transfer Gutierrez-Lopez v. Figueroa, CV-20-00732- PHX-JAT (JFM) to this Court. (3) All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following case number: CV-20-00732-PHX-SPL (JFM). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/21/2020. (Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00514-SPL--MTM, 2:20-cv-00654-SPL--JFM, 2:20-cv-00732-JAT--JFM) (WLP)
April 20, 2020 Filing 33 * Filed at Doc. #36 pursuant to {35] Order - LODGED Proposed Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Green, Matthew) *Modified on 4/22/2020 (WLP).
April 20, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply In Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Application for Temporary Restraining Order by Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Green, Matthew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Perla Beatriz Gutierrez-Lopez. (Associated Cases: CV-20-654-PHX-SPL (FJM), CV-20-732-PHX-JAT (JFM)) (LAD) (redocketed by the clerk for administrative purposes, entitled Petitioner's Motion for Voluntary Transfer of Case)
April 16, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) by Respondents William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O-P)(WLP)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Respondents' Unopposed Motion to File a Responsive Pleading in Excess of 17 Pages (Doc. #24 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file the lodged Response to the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #25 ). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/13/2020. (WLP)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Respondents shall have until 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, April 16, 2020, to file a Response to the Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction #26 . Petitioner shall have until 12:00 p.m. on Monday, April 20, 2020, to file a Reply to Respondents' Response. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/13/2020. (LMR)
April 12, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Green, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 25 *Filed at doc. #29 pursuant to #28 Order -- LODGED Proposed Response in Opposition to the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re: #24 MOTION for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading in Excess of 17 Pages (Unopposed). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O-P)(Sichi, Elizabeth) *Modified on 4/14/2020 (WLP).
April 10, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File a Responsive Pleading in Excess of 17 Pages (Unopposed) by William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Petitioners-Plaintiffs' #22 Motion to Transfer is granted. The Clerk of Court shall transfer Urdaneta v. Keeton, CV-20-00654-PHX-JAT (JFM) to this Court. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/8/20. (GMP)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer Related Case (Motion to Transfer Case to Judge Steven P. Logan) by Bismer Rodriguez Alvarez, Geidys Calzadilla Borrero, Miriam Gomez Cantillano, Noel Mejia Hernandez, Claudia Avalos Inchicaque, Landy Sanchez Ramos, Jose Vargas Saucedo, Jhonnatan Brinez Urdaneta. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-20-00654-PHX-JAT, CV-20-00514-PHX-SPL) (Barr, Daniel)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Respondents McHenry, Davis, and Habich are dismissed without prejudice. Petitioner's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied without prejudice. Respondents shall have 10 days from the date of this Order to answer the #19 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer absent leave of Court. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the filing of Respondents' Answer to file a Reply. Petitioner must file a "Notice of Change in Status"with the Clerk of Court within 2 days of any material change in Petitioner's immigration or custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/3/2020. (MSA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondents William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Marisol Mendoza filed by Marisol Mendoza. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence With Respondents, Mar. 25, 2020)(Green, Matthew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Marisol Mendoza Amended Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opposing Counsel's Written Consent)(Green, Matthew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Petitioner's Motion for Immediate Release filed in Ninth Circuit Case No. 17-71545 (Corrected) by Respondents William Barr, Enrique Lucero, Chad Wolf. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Petitioner's Motion for Immediate Release filed in Ninth Circuit Case no. 17-71545. The motion is pending transfer to this Court pursuant to Circuit Judge's Order issued March 31, 2020. by Respondents William Barr, John W Davis, Paul M Habich, Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibits A-M)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 USCA Case Number re: Petition for Review, Ninth Circuit Case number 17-71545. (Originally filed at Ninth Circuit on 5/26/17). (LAD)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED : Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition/Summons/Order/Motion upon William Barr on 3/24/2020. (MSA)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons/Petition/Motion/Order upon U.S. Attorney (attn: civil process clerk) on 3/23/20. (SST)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED: Certified Mail Receipt re: Petition/Motion/Summons/Order upon Henry Lucero on 3/20/20. (SST)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Chad Wolf, Enrique Lucero, U.S. Attorney's Office - District of Arizona Attn: Civil Process Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(WLP)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Respondents McHenry, Davis, and Habich are dismissed without prejudice. (2) Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ) is denied in part as to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (3) Petitioner's Motion for Order to Show Cause (Doc. #8 ) is denied. (4) The Clerk of Court shall serve: (1) a copy of the Summons, (2) the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ), (3) the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. [2), and (4) this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court shall also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents Barr, Wolf, and Lucero pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (5) Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to answer the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ). Respondents shall not file a dispositive motion in place of an answer absent leave of Court. (6) Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Answer to the Petition to file a Reply. Failure to file a Reply may be deemed as consent to the denial of the Petition on the grounds presented in Respondents' Answer. (7) Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of service to file a Response to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ). (8) Petitioner shall have 15 days from the filing of Respondents' Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a Reply. (9) Petitioner must file a "Notice of Change in Status" with the Clerk of Court within 5 days of any material change in Petitioner's immigration or custody status. Petitioner may not include a motion for other relief with the Notice. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/18/2020. (WLP)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Marisol Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Green, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #3 Memorandum (Supplemental) by Petitioner Marisol Mendoza. (Green, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kay Sichi on behalf of William Barr, John W Davis, Paul M Habich, Enrique Lucero, James McHenry, Chad Wolf. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Marisol Mendoza. (Green, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(MYE)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 COMBINED MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) and #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Petitioner Marisol Mendoza. (Green, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MYE)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order by Marisol Mendoza. (Green, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit of Matthew H. Green)(MYE)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-18054388 filed by Marisol Mendoza. (Green, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul M Habich
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Enrique Lucero
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James McHenry
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W Davis
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marisol Mendoza
Represented By: Matthew Harrison Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?