Preferred Investments LLC et al v. Johnston et al
Plaintiff: Preferred Investments LLC and BLG Consulting PLLC
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Duston Johnston and Monica Johnston
Case Number: 2:2020cv00520
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants, as the party asserting jurisdiction via removal and therefore the party with the burden of establishing federal subject matter jurisdiction, shall show cause in writing (not to exceed 10 pages) by 5/1/2020, why this case should not be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Response (not to exceed 10 pages) by 5/22/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no Reply shall be filed unless one is requested by the Court. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 4/9/2020. (RMW)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Defendant Duston Johnston's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Duston Johnston may refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, or in the alternative pay the case opening fee, on or before 5/1/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant does not refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the case opening fee on or before 5/1/2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action on 5/4/2020 without prejudice and without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 4/9/2020. (RMW)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (HLA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-520-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Duston Johnston. (HLA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pioneer Justice Court, Pinal County Arizona, case number CC-2020-000260 filed by Duston Johnston. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(HLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preferred Investments LLC et al v. Johnston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duston Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preferred Investments LLC
Represented By: Scott Edward Williams
Represented By: Scott Andrew Baluha
Represented By: Mark Bradley Zinman
Represented By: Melissa Alice Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLG Consulting PLLC
Represented By: Scott Edward Williams
Represented By: Scott Andrew Baluha
Represented By: Mark Bradley Zinman
Represented By: Melissa Alice Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?