Treon et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Treon, Janie Treon and Dennis M Treon
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv00529
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dennis M Treon, Janie Treon. (Treon, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Stipulation To Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Reply to Defendant Aetna's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #13 ). The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a Reply in support of their Motion to Remand (Doc. #11 ) is extended to May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/5/2020. (JAMA)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE THEIR REPLY TO DEFENDANT AETNA'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND TO MONDAY, MAY 11, 2020 by Dennis M Treon, Janie Treon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Reply to Defendant Aetna's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to Monday, May 11 2020)(Treon, Richard)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dennis M Treon, Janie Treon. (Treon, Richard)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/6/2020. (JAMA)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Richard T Treon. (Treon, Richard)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Answer to Complaint. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Andrews, Ann-Martha)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/17/2020. (JAMA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DXD)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18067750. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00529-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Aetna Incorporated, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated for Aetna Life Insurance Company (submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews). (DXD)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-015112. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18067750 filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company (submitted by Ann-Martha Andrews). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet) (DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treon et al v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ann-Martha Andrews
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Treon
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M Treon
Represented By: Richard T Treon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?