Reish et al v. Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ryuko, Inc., Robert Reish and Kathleen Reish
Defendant: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated, Louie Mukai and Liquidation Trust
Appellant: Ryuko Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00555
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re: #10 MOTION for Attorney Fees The Phoenix Heliparts, Inc. Liquidation Trust's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Liquidation Trust, Louie Mukai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Cross, James)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Trustee's Motion for Fees Re: Motion to Withdraw Reference. The deadline for the response to Trustee Louie Mukai's #10 Motion for attorneys' fees is extended to 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/6/2020. (MMO)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION for Attorney Fees The Phoenix Heliparts, Inc. Liquidation Trust's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order in PDF)(Horner, H)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata re: #10 MOTION for Attorney Fees The Phoenix Heliparts, Inc. Liquidation Trust's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Appellees Liquidation Trust, Louie Mukai.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed order)(Cross, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees The Phoenix Heliparts, Inc. Liquidation Trust's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses by Liquidation Trust, Louie Mukai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cross, James)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Appellants' motion to withdraw the reference (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this matter. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/9/2020. (WLP)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc. filed by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Horner, H)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc. The Phoenix Heliparts, Inc. Liquidation Trust's Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Liquidation Trust, Louie Mukai. (Cross, James)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liquidation Trust, Louie Mukai. (Cross, James)
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc.. (Horner, H)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Liquidation Trust, Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated, Ryuko, Inc. (MSA)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Docketing of Bankruptcy Matter. (MSA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc.. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Kathleen Reish, Robert Reish, Ryuko, Inc.. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reish et al v. Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryuko, Inc.
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Reish
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Heliparts Incorporated
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louie Mukai
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquidation Trust
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ryuko Incorporated
Represented By: H Lee Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?