Treakle et al v. Reinalt-Thomas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle
Defendant: Reinalt-Thomas Corporation and Discount Tire Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv00587
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from May 4, 2020 to July 2, 2020. Defendants' opening memorandum may not exceed 22 pages. Plaintiffs shall file their responsive memorandum by August 3, 2020. Plaintiffs' responsive memorandum may not exceed 22 pages. Defendants shall file their reply memorandum by August 18, 2020. Defendants' reply memorandum may not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/4/20. (MAW)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Initial Response Deadline & Page Limits & to Set Briefing Schedule, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Discount Tire Company Incorporated, Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael T Williams on behalf of Defendants Discount Tire Company Incorporated and Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 23, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Charles LaDuca removed as counsel for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 21, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric Neil Linsk on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 20, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for J Olin McDougall, II on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 10, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher C Kessler on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 31, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brendan Stephen Thompson on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 25, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert K Shelquist on behalf of Plaintiffs Randall Joe Thigpen, Thomas Treakle. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Reinalt-Thomas Corporation and Discount Tire Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18096813. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-587-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Randall Joe Thigpen and Thomas Treakle. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18096813 filed by Thomas Treakle, Randall Joe Thigpen. (Robinovitch, Hart) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treakle et al v. Reinalt-Thomas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinalt-Thomas Corporation
Represented By: Michael T Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Tire Company Incorporated
Represented By: Michael T Williams
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Joe Thigpen
Represented By: Brendan Stephen Thompson
Represented By: J Olin McDougall, II
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Charles J LaDuca
Represented By: Eric Neil Linsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Treakle
Represented By: Brendan Stephen Thompson
Represented By: J Olin McDougall, II
Represented By: Chris C Kessler
Represented By: Robert K Shelquist
Represented By: Hart Lawrence Robinovitch
Represented By: Charles J LaDuca
Represented By: Eric Neil Linsk
Represented By: Christopher C Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?