Hill v. Maricopa, County of et al
Plaintiff: Justin Dwayne Hill
Defendant: J Rogers, Unknown Perry, L Tijerina, Pamela Brooks, Unknown Bowser, Paul Penzone, Jesse Spurgin, K Barnes, Unknown West, Unknown Payne, Unknown Myers, M Fulaylor, Unknown Siri, Unknown Manisealco, Gerardo Gregorio, Bill Williams, Brian Lee, Scott Vail, David Kiss, Unknown Parties, Eric Miceli, O Udosi, Unknown Kindell-House, Maricopa, County of, Grant Phillips, Unknown Bretado, Unknown Torrez, Unknown Lamunyon, T Newman, Unknown Weber, Unknown Magana, Rick Wilson, Brandon Smith, Unknown Varasie, V Arteaga, Brent Williams, Unknown Lager, Unknown Dicks, Unknown Barron-Irby, M Hollingshead, S Perez, Unknown Marty, Scott Frye, Unknown Samaniego and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2020cv00603
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - (1) Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. #8 ) is granted. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint in compliance with the April 8, 2020 Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Plaintiff's "Request to Exceed 21 Page Limit and Extension [of] Time to File First Amended Complaint" (Doc. #6 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must not file the proposed First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/2020. (LAD)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint by Justin Dwayne Hill. (3 pages) (GMP)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 LODGED Proposed Amended Complaint re: #6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Justin Dwayne Hill. (31 pages) (GMP)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Justin Dwayne Hill. (2 pages) (GMP)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's "Motion to exceed page limit" (Doc. #4 ) is denied. (2) Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file an amended complaint in compliance with the March 27, 2020 Order and this Order. (3) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/8/20. (SLQ)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit Pages for First Amended Complaint by Justin Dwayne Hill.(3 pages) (MSA)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - (1) Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 -1 at 3-12) is dismissed for failure to file on a court-approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (2) If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot.(3) The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/27/2020. (LAD)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (LAD)
March 25, 2020 ***** State Court record received on 3/25/2020 ***** Service Returned Unexecuted by Justin Dwayne Hill: Summons and Complaint as to Scott Frye-Contract, Rick Wilson MCSO-Non Active, DO Torrez Non Active, Sgt. 6741. DO Dicks B3527, Sgt. Myers B0316, Sgt. Siri B1812. **** Affidavits on Non-Service filed in State Court on 03/19/2020, docketed in US District Court on 03/25/2020 for case management purposes ***** (LAD) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-003046. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18110925 filed by Scott Vail, Unknown Lager, Brian Lee, Unknown Samaniego, Unknown Manisealco, Unknown Bretado, Unknown Varasie, Unknown Lamunyon, Unknown Bowser, V Arteaga, Unknown Magana, Unknown Perry, Unknown Weber, Unknown Barron-Irby, T Newman, L Tijerina, Brandon Smith, J Rogers, Paul Penzone, Unknown Kindell-House, Unknown West, Brent Williams, Eric Miceli, Unknown Marty, M Fulaylor, Unknown Party named as Chief A9716, Unknown Party named as Sgt. A8992, Unknown Party named as Sgt. A7644, Unknown Party named as DO B2377, Unknown Party named as Lt. A7994, Unknown Party named as DO B2557. (Submitted by Jennifer Lockerby) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Maricopa, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Rogers
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Perry
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Tijerina
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bowser
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Penzone
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Spurgin
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown West
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Fulaylor
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Siri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Manisealco
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Gregorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lee
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Vail
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Miceli
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O Udosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kindell-House
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bretado
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lamunyon
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Newman
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Weber
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Magana
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Varasie
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Arteaga
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Williams
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lager
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Barron-Irby
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hollingshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Marty
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Samaniego
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Lockerby
Represented By: Sherle Rubin Flaggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dwayne Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?