Anderson et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bridget Ott and Tammy Anderson
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00612
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend The Deadline to Complete the Joint Proposed Case Management Plan and to Postpone the Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stafford, Karen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tammy Anderson, Bridget Ott. (Levin, Mick)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Stafford, Karen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Tammy Anderson. (Robertson, John)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tammy Anderson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tammy Anderson. (Levin, Mick)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/8/2020. (JAMA)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Stafford, Karen)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/31/2020. (JAMA)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18116877. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00612-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MSA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 **State Court record received on 3/26/2020**SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tammy Anderson, Bridget Ott: Declaration of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Demand for Jury Trial/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Salley Manzoio of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 2/28/2020. **Filed in State Court on 3/5/2020 and docketed in US District Court on 3/26/2020 for case management purposes** (MSA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Incorporated, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Incorporated for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Submitted by Karen Stafford) (MSA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Submitted by Karen Stafford) (MSA)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-002145. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18116877 filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Submitted by Karen Stafford) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental)(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Represented By: Victoria Renee Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Ott
Represented By: John Patrick Robertson, II
Represented By: Mick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Anderson
Represented By: John Patrick Robertson, II
Represented By: Mick Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?