Supima v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Supima
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00617
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Dispositive motions due by 2/26/2021. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/21/2020. (CLB)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the Rule 16 Case Management Conference, presently set for May 29, 2020 before Honorable Steven P. Logan, is vacated. Order to follow. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/21/2020. (CLB)
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Counter Defendant Supima, Plaintiff Supima. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kethcart, Robert)
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Supima. (Regula, Ryan)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Samberg, Amy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Supima. (Regula, Ryan)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Supima. (Regula, Ryan)
April 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Supima. (Regula, Ryan)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 5/29/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 Supima's ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company by Supima.(Kethcart, Robert)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3a, #4 Exhibit 3b, #5 Exhibit 3c, #6 Exhibit 3d, #7 Exhibit 3e)(Samberg, Amy)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Supima. (Regula, Ryan)
April 7, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Traci M Ribeiro on behalf of Counter Claimant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Defendant Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Service of Preliminary Order by Supima . (Kethcart, Robert)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3a, #4 Exhibit 3b, #5 Exhibit 3c, #6 Exhibit 3d, #7 Exhibit 3e)(Samberg, Amy)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/30/2020. (LMR)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-617-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (EJA)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18120653. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00617-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(EJA)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings Incorporated for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(submitted by Amy M. Samberg) (EJA)
March 27, 2020 *****State Court Record Received on 3/27/20*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Supima: Certificate of Service re: summons, complaint, certificate on compulsory arbitration, demand for jury trial upon Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company on 2/28/20*****Filed in State Court on 3/3/20 and docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/27/20 for case management purposes***** (EJA) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-002764. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18120653 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(submitted by Amy M. Samberg) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 1D, #5 Exhibit 1E, #6 Exhibit 1F, #7 Exhibit 1G, #8 Exhibit 1H, #9 Exhibit 1I, #10 Exhibit 1J, #11 Exhibit 1K, #12 Exhibit 2, #13 Exhibit 3, #14 Exhibit 4, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supima v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supima
Represented By: Robert Francis Kethcart
Represented By: Charles F Hauff
Represented By: Ryan James Regula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Represented By: Traci M Ribeiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?