Cordova v. Harlo Products Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Guillermina Cordova
Defendant: Harlo Products Corporation and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2020cv00692
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Louie J Cook on behalf of Plaintiff Guillermina Cordova. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to by Harlo Products Corporation. (Fitch, Douglas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Harlo Products Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Answer)(Fitch, Douglas)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/30/20. (GMP)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Harlo Products Corporation.(Fitch, Douglas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Guillermina Cordova: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Notice Parties MIDP upon Harlo Products Corp. on 04/13/2020. (Williamson, Charles)
April 29, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys David E Harris and Louie J Cook removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 7, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/7/2020. (MSA)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harlo Products Corporation. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ARC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18154784. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-692-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Guillermina Cordova. (Williamson, Charles) (ARC)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18154784 filed by Guillermina Cordova. (Williamson, Charles) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordova v. Harlo Products Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlo Products Corporation
Represented By: Douglas H Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermina Cordova
Represented By: Louie J Cook
Represented By: Charles Blaine Williamson
Represented By: Curt William Clausen
Represented By: David E Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?