Advanced Green Innovations, LLC et al v. Dual Fuel, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dual Fuel AZ II, LLC, Advanced Green Innovations, LLC, ZHRO Power, LLC, Jeff Beach, Green Tech Diesel Conversions, LLC, DF Empower, LLC, Lomar Holdings, LLC, Green Engine Conversions, LLC and Beach Corp
Defendant: Cochise Investments, LLC, Kenneth Losch, Conway Feed, LLC, Lori Losch and Dual Fuel, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00788
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-00068-MCW to Proceed in District Court (Doc. #2 ) is denied. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/22/2020. (LAD)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 *REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding 2:20-ap-00068-MCW to Proceed in District Court by Defendants Cochise Investments LLC, Dual Fuel LLC, Kenneth Losch, Lori Losch. (Jones, Michael) *Modified to correct event on 5/14/2020 (DXD).
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Cochise Investments, LLC, Dual Fuel, LLC, Kenneth Losch, Lori Losch Joinder in Response to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding 2:20-0068-MCW to Proceed in District Court filed by Advanced Green Innovations LLC. (Carmel, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Cochise Investments, LLC, Dual Fuel, LLC, Kenneth Losch, Lori Losch (Response to "Motion For Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding 2:20-Ap-00068-MCW To Proceed In District Court") filed by Jeff Beach, Beach Corporation, Conway Feed LLC, DF Empower LLC, Dual Fuel AZ II LLC, Green Engine Conversions LLC, Green Tech Diesel Conversions LLC, Lomar Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Lacey, Alisa)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Matter. (EJA)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Cochise Investments, LLC, Dual Fuel, LLC, Kenneth Losch, Lori Losch. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Cochise Investments, LLC, Dual Fuel, LLC, Kenneth Losch, Lori Losch. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Green Innovations, LLC et al v. Dual Fuel, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dual Fuel AZ II, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Green Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Michael W Carmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHRO Power, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Michael W Carmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Beach
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tech Diesel Conversions, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DF Empower, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lomar Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Engine Conversions, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beach Corp
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise Investments, LLC
Represented By: Michael Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Losch
Represented By: Michael Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway Feed, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Losch
Represented By: Michael Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dual Fuel, LLC
Represented By: Michael Aaron Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?