CALLRN Franchise LLC et al v. JL2 Holdings Incoporated et al
Plaintiff: Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC and CALLRN Franchise LLC
Defendant: JL2 Holdings Incoporated, Assisted Living Michelle Cohen LLC, Lara Dickerson and Michelle Cohen
Case Number: 2:2020cv01091
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims (Doc. #34 ). The deadline for Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant CALLRN Franchise, LLC to respond to Defendant/Counterclaimant JL2 Holdings, Inc.'s counterclaims (Doc. #30 ) is extended to 8/10/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/24/2020. (RMW)
July 22, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION re: #30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER (text only): Pursuant to the Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request to Vacate Hearing (Doc. #32 ), IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument set for 7/29/2020 is vacated. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/8/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
July 7, 2020 Filing 32 *WITHDRAWAL of Document re: #2 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MOTION TO VACATE HEARING by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC . (Wolf, Jeffrey) *Modified to correct event type and add motion part on 7/8/2020 (EJA).
July 7, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #30 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 30 DEFENDANTS JL2 HOLDINGS, INC., AND LARA DICKERSON'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CALLRN Franchise LLC by Lara Dickerson, JL2 Holdings Incoporated.(Hotchkiss, Glenn)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The deadline for Defendants JL2 Holdings, Inc. and Lara Dickerson to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 7/6/2020. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/29/2020. (RMW)
June 26, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (First Request) by Lara Dickerson, JL2 Holdings Incoporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hotchkiss, Glenn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES; EXHIBITS 1-13; NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION; PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-7; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-1 O; CIVIL COVERSHEET upon Lara Dickerson on 06/12/20. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PERMANENT INJUNCTION ON CONSENT AND ORDER: This action is dismissed, without prejudice, as to Defendants Michelle Cohen and Assisted Living Michelle Cohen, LLC ONLY, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. Because Defendants Lara Dickerson and JL2 holdings Inc. remain, the Clerk of the Court shall not close this case. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/23/2020. (RMW)
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF LODGING OF PROPOSED FORM OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION ON CONSENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS MICHELLE COHEN AND ASSISTED LIVING MICHELLE COHEN, LLC ONLY by CALLRN Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2020 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES; EXHIBITS 1-13; NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION; PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-7; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-1 O; CIVIL COVERSHEET upon JL2 Holdings, Inc. on 06/09/20. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES; EXHIBITS 1-13; NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION; PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-7; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-1 O; CIVIL COVERSHEET upon Michelle Cohen on 06/09/20. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC: Certificate of Service re: CIVIL SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES; EXHIBITS 1-13; NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO EXERCISE JURISDICTION; PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-7; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; EXHIBITS 1-1 O; CIVIL COVERSHEET upon Assisted Living Michelle Cohen, LLC on 06/09/20. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/17/2020. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Lara Dickerson and JL2 Holdings Incorporated ONLY shall file their response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) by no later than Friday, 7/10/2020. Plaintiff may file a reply by no later than Monday, 7/20/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting oral argument on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Doc. #2 ), for Wednesday, 7/29/2020 at 1:30 PM. The parties shall advise the Court by no later than Thursday, 7/23/2020, if an evidentiary hearing is desired. See the attached order for additional information. (Court Reporter Barbara Stockford) Hearing held 2:01 PM to 2:25 PM.(RMW)
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE re: Service of Telephonic Status Conference by CALLRN Franchise LLC re: 18 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED setting a Telephonic Status Conference for Wednesday, 6/17/2020 at 2:00 PM. Plaintiffs' counsel will receive call-in instructions via email to participate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs must give notice to Defendants' counsel of the status conference and the call-in instructions. By 12:00 PM on Monday, 6/15/2020, Plaintiffs must file a notice with the Court indicating how notice was given to Defendants. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/12/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request to Set Hearing by CALLRN Franchise LLC . (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Lara Dickerson. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 *NOTICE re: Notice of Clarification re Plaintiffs' Lodging of Proposed Order to Show Cause by CALLRN Franchise LLC, Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC re: #10 Notice (Other) . (Wolf, Jeffrey) *Modified to add filrs on 6/8/2020 (EJA).
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Supplement filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC. The summons submitted cannot be issued since the defendant's name does not match what we have on the docket. Please re-submit corrected summons using the Summons Submitted event located under the Civil tab, Amended Pleadings and Service, Service of Process, Summons Submitted. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (text only): The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Proposed Order to Show Cause and Notice of Hearing and Briefing Schedule (Doc. #10 ). Rule 65(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure states that a preliminary injunction may only be issued on notice to the adverse party. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall provide notice as to when Defendants have been served with process, including the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ), at which point the Court will address a briefing schedule and potential hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/5/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 *Summons Submitted as to Lara Dickerson Individually by Plaintiff CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey) *Modified to correct event type on 6/5/2020 (EJA).
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Lodging of Proposed Order to Show Cause and Notice of Hearing and Briefing Schedule by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Wolf, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Supporting documents originally filed in error with Complaint at Doc 1.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Ex 3 as to Alivero, #2 Supplement Ex 4 as to Alivero, #3 Supplement Exs 5 - 7 as to Alivero, #4 Supplement Exs 1 - 5 as to Morgan, #5 Supplement Exs 6 - 10 as to Morgan)(BAC)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court interprets Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) to seek a preliminary injunction only. IT IS ORDERED that if, as indicated in the motion's conclusion (id. at 23), Plaintiffs seek a temporary restraining order, they must file an amended motion or otherwise notify the Court. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 6/4/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Assisted Living Michelle Cohen LLC, Michelle Cohen, Lara Dickerson, JL2 Holdings Incoporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(BAC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18341082. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01091-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey)(BAC)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 *WITHDRAWN by (Doc. #32 ) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC, CALLRN Franchise LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Alivero Declaration ISO Motion, #2 Supplement Morgan Declaration ISO Motion)(BAC) Modified on 7/8/2020 (EJA).
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18341082 filed by CALLRN Franchise LLC, Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC. (Wolf, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7-10, #7 Exhibit 11-13, #8 Supplement Exs 1 - 2, #9 Supplement Ex 3, #10 Supplement Ex 4, #11 Supplement Exs 1 - 5, #12 Supplement Exs 5 - 7, #13 Supplement Exs 6 - 10)(BAC) *Modified on 6/4/2020 to reflect Supplemental Exhibits attached in error, now correctly filed at Doc. 9. (BAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CALLRN Franchise LLC et al v. JL2 Holdings Incoporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assisted Living Locators Licensing LLC
Represented By: Amy Levine Heiserman
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALLRN Franchise LLC
Represented By: Amy Levine Heiserman
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL2 Holdings Incoporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assisted Living Michelle Cohen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?