Franco v. Mesa Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Franco
Defendant: Mesa Police Department, Courtney Dillavou, Unknown Fajardo, David Marks, Unknown Slemmer, Unknown Marks, Alan Grantham, Unknown Hale, Unknown Flanigan, Unknown Grantham, Jared Ryan, Unknown Shupe, Unknown Enders, Lisa Shupe, James Gowdy, Ross Pagel, Unknown Parties, Jeremy Jones, Jason Fajardo, Unknown Ryan, Janeal Hale, Dalia Ellington Garcia Starks, Unknown Dillavou, Kyle Enders, Lindsay Guthrie, Unknown Shook, Gerald Slemmer, Unknown Ellington Garcia Starks, Stephen Walker, Karrie Flanigan, Unknown Gowdy, Unknown Guthrie, Unknown Walker, Mesa Public Schools, Unknown Jones, Unknown Pagel, Andrea Shook, Courtni Ender, Unknown Starks and Kristen Walker
Case Number: 2:2020cv01129
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 29 Joinder re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X , #14 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Kyle Enders, Unknown Enders, Stephen Walker, Unknown Walker. (Langan, Thomas)
August 4, 2020 Filing 28 Joinder re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X , #14 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Jeremy Jones, Ross Pagel, Unknown Pagel. (Murphy, Brendan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 *RESPONSE re: #20 Joinder re: #4 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims filed by Tiffany Franco. (Small, Elisabeth) *Modified to correct event on 8/4/2020 (DXD).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: For good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service of Process (Doc. #25 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 17, 2020 to effect service of process on any unserved Defendants. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/27/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 24, 2020 Filing 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Deadline for Service of Process by Tiffany Franco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Sean)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER approving the #22 Stipulation and granting an extension until August 5, 2020 for Defendants Kyle and Courtni Enders and Stephen and Kristen Walker to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/23/2020. (LFIG)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian David Quinn on behalf of Alan Grantham. (Quinn, Ian)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kyle Enders, Unknown Enders, Stephen Walker, Unknown Walker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Langan, Thomas)
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE re: Notice of Certification of Conferral by James Gowdy, Janeal Hale, David Marks, Andrea Shook, Lisa Shupe, Gerald Slemmer re: #20 Joinder in Motion to Dismiss. (Pauole, David)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 Joinder re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X by Defendants James Gowdy, Janeal Hale, David Marks, Andrea Shook, Lisa Shupe, Gerald Slemmer. (Pauole, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Having considered the Stipulation For Extension of Time for Defendants Jeremy Jones, Ross Pagel, and Jane Pagel to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #18 ), and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the Stipulation (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Jeremey Jones, Ross Pagel, and Jane Pagel shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by August 5, 2020. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/20/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Jeremy Jones, Ross Pagel, Unknown Pagel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Murphy, Brendan)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal of Count III (Title IX) of the Complaint as to the Individual Defendants Only (Doc. #16 ) is APPROVED. IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Count III (Title IX) of the Complaint is DISMISSED as to the Individual Defendants only, with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. Count III will remain against Defendant Mesa Public Schools only. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/16/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Stipulated Dismissal of Count III of the Complaint as to the Individual Defendants Only by Tiffany Franco. (Woods, Sean)
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mesa Police Department's Motion to Dismiss filed by Mesa Police Department. (Stoutner, Duncan)
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X filed by Mesa Public Schools. (Pauole, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 , #12 Responses in Opposition to Motion. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X filed by Tiffany Franco. (Woods, Sean)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mesa Police Department's Motion to Dismiss filed by Tiffany Franco. (Woods, Sean)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tiffany Franco: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/23/2020 to Karrie Flanigan . (Woods, Sean)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Courtney Dillavou, Unknown Dillavou, Dalia Ellington Garcia Starks, Unknown Ellington Garcia Starks, Kyle Enders, Unknown Enders, Jason Fajardo, Unknown Fajardo, Karrie Flanigan, Unknown Flanigan, James Gowdy, Unknown Gowdy, Alan Grantham, Unknown Grantham, Lindsay Guthrie, Unknown Guthrie, Janeal Hale, Unknown Hale, Jeremy Jones, Unknown Jones, David Marks, Unknown Marks, Ross Pagel, Unknown Pagel, Jared Ryan, Unknown Ryan, Andrea Shook, Unknown Shook, Lisa Shupe, Unknown Shupe, Gerald Slemmer, Unknown Slemmer, Stephen Walker, Unknown Walker. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Tiffany Franco. (Woods, Sean)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Notice of Certification of Conferral by Mesa Police Department . (Stoutner, Duncan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mesa Police Department's Motion to Dismiss by Mesa Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stoutner, Duncan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Notice of Certification of Conferral by Mesa Public Schools re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X . (Pauole, David)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Counts I, II, III, IX and X by Mesa Public Schools. (Pauole, David)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/8/2020. (LFIG)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18357347. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1129-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005955. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18357347 filed by Mesa Unified School District. (Pauole, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet -pgs 3-5, #4 Exhibit A)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. Mesa Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Police Department
Represented By: Duncan Jeffrey Stoutner
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Lindvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Dillavou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marks
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Slemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Grantham
Represented By: Ian David Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Enders
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Shupe
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gowdy
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Pagel
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Jones
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Fajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janeal Hale
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalia Ellington Garcia Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dillavou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Enders
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Slemmer
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ellington Garcia Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Walker
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Walker
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Public Schools
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Pagel
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Shook
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtni Ender
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Walker
Represented By: Thomas Anthony Langan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Franco
Represented By: Sean Anthony Woods
Represented By: Robert T Mills
Represented By: Elisabeth Ann Small
Represented By: Scott Andrew Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?