Cincinnati Insurance Company v. U-Line Corporation
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: U-Line Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01171
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER pursuant to the #10 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file its answer/responsive pleading by 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/28/2020. (ESG)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by U-Line Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Djordjevich, Dusan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dusan John Djordjevich on behalf of U-Line Corporation. (Djordjevich, Dusan)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 9/10/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/15/2020. (ESG)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/15/2020. (ESG)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/15/2020. (ESG)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U-Line Corporation. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18376864. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01171-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (submitted by Megan Ritenour) (REK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (submitted by Megan Ritenour) (REK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18376864 filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (submitted by Megan Ritenour) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. U-Line Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Ritenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U-Line Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?