Denning v. Milbank Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donna Denning
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Milbank Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01217
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #8 Notice of Settlement: This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on August 27, 2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/2020. (CLB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: The Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2020 is VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CLB)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Milbank Insurance Company. (Caravetta, William)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Donna Denning. (Sacco, Paul)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for 7/29/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge David G Campbell. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6/30/2020. (CLB)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Milbank Insurance Company.(Caravetta, William)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18395145. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01217-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Milbank Insurance Company. (submitted by William Caravetta) (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Milbank Insurance Company. (submitted by William Caravetta) (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-006283. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18395145 filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (submitted by William Caravetta) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denning v. Milbank Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Denning
Represented By: Paul J Sacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: William George Caravetta
Represented By: Michael Anthony Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?