Cobb et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Jason Cobb and Gretchen Cobb
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01262
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-222) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP)
July 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joshua A Karr on behalf of Plaintiffs Gretchen Cobb, Jason Cobb. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 24, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/26/2020. (JAMA)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/26/2020. (JAMA)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18419538. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01262-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Gretchen Cobb, Jason Cobb. (submitted by Jonathan O'Steen) (REK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Gretchen Cobb, Jason Cobb. (submitted by Jonathan O'Steen) (REK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18419538 filed by Jason Cobb, Gretchen Cobb. (submitted by Jonathan O'Steen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Cobb
Represented By: Joshua A Karr
Represented By: Jonathan Van OSteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Cobb
Represented By: Joshua A Karr
Represented By: Jonathan Van OSteen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?