Carranza v. PCT International Incorporated
Appellant: Jovita Carranza
Appellee: PCT International, Inc. and PCT International Incorporated
Debtor: Andes Industries Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01307
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a Memo Re: Status of Certificate of Readiness (Doc. [7)] that states that the Certificate of Readiness that was filed on July 17, 2020 was in error (Doc. [5)]. As a result, the Court has prematurely issued a Scheduling Order in this matter. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Order that was issued following the Certificate of Readiness and pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8008 and 8009 (Doc. #6 ) is hereby STRICKEN. A new Scheduling Order shall be issued upon a true and correct Certificate of Readiness from the Bankruptcy Court. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/27/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STRICKEN by Doc. 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: PURSUANT to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8008 and 8009, and by this order, the appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellant's brief; and the appellant may serve and file a reply with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellee's brief. See attachment for further details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/21/2020. (CLB) Modified on 7/27/2020 (LFIG).
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PCT International Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Andes Industries Incorporated for PCT International Incorporated. (Rudd, Philip)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to PCT International Incorporated. (REK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carranza v. PCT International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jovita Carranza
Represented By: Kevin Paul VanLandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PCT International, Inc.
Represented By: Philip R Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PCT International Incorporated
Represented By: Philip R Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Andes Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?