Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC et al v. National Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Jethawks Baseball LP, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, West Virginia Baseball LLC, SAJ Baseball LLC, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP doing business as Myrtle Beach Pelicans, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Amarillo Sod Poodles, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Eugene Emeralds, West Virginia Baseball LLC doing business as West Virginia Power, Frisco Roughriders LP doing business as Frisco Roughriders, Jethawks Baseball LP doing business as Lancaster Jethawks, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC doing business as Chattanooga Lookouts, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Idaho Falls Chukars, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated doing business as Inland Empire 66ers, 7th Inning Stretch LLC doing business as Stockton Ports, Columbia Fireflies LLC doing business as Columbia Fireflies, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as San Antonio Missions, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC doing business as Fort Wayne TinCaps and Fredericksburg Baseball LLC doing business as Fredericksburg Nationals
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company, National Casualty Company and Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01312
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company filed by SAJ Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Jethawks Baseball LP, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, West Virginia Baseball LLC, 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Hennigan, J)
August 17, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jay R Sever nad Katie W Myers on behalf of Defendants National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Set the Time for Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Respond. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by no later than 8/21/2020. Defendants shall file their response to the amended complaint by no later than 9/11/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/13/2020. (MMO)
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Set the Time for Plaintiffs to File and Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Respond by National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cabianca, Brian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Andrew Cabianca on behalf of National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Cabianca, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Rebecca Anne Guiterman, Andrew L Sandler, and Stephen Michael LeBlanc on behalf of Plaintiffs 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, and West Virginia Baseball LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 3, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Patrick Pijls on behalf of Plaintiffs 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Arizona Department of Insurance for Scottsdale Insurance Co. on July 6, 2020. (Hennigan, J)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Corporate Service Company as Registered Agent for Scottsdale Indemnity Co. on July 7, 2020. (Hennigan, J)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Arizona Department of Insurance for National Casualty Company on July 6, 2020. (Hennigan, J)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER pursuant to #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead: National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, and Scottsdale Insurance Company answer due 8/14/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/24/2020. (MMO)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zitzer, Kurt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M Zitzer on behalf of National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Zitzer, Kurt)
July 21, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Robin Cohen, John Briody, Patrick Pijls, Andrew L Sandler, Stephen M LeBlanc, and Rebecca Guiterman removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted attorneys. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC: Certified Mail Receipt re: Order at Dkt 12 upon Defendants on July 10, 2020. (Hennigan, J)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/6/2020. (MMO)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, West Virginia Baseball LLC. (Hennigan, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fredericksburg Baseball LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mundek Baseball Corp. for Fredericksburg Baseball LLC. (Hennigan, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Elmore Sports Group, Ltd. for San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated. (Hennigan, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jethawks Baseball LP identifying Corporate Parent Grand Slam Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent 1015241 BC Ltd. for Jethawks Baseball LP. (Hennigan, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to National Casualty Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC. (Hennigan, J)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC. (Hennigan, J)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC. (Hennigan, J)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Jethawks Baseball LP, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, SAJ Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, West Virginia Baseball LLC. (REK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18437039. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01312-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18437039 filed by SAJ Baseball LLC, Greenjackets Baseball LLC, Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated, Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated, Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC, Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC, Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC, Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated, Columbia Fireflies LLC, Jethawks Baseball LP, Boise Professional Baseball LLC, Frisco Roughriders LP, Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated, Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP, Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC, San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated, Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC, West Virginia Baseball LLC, 7th Inning Stretch LLC, Fredericksburg Baseball LLC, Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC. (submitted by J Hennigan) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC et al v. National Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boise Professional Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7th Inning Stretch LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisco Roughriders LP
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenjackets Hospitality Food & Beverage Services LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredericksburg Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenjackets Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agon Sports and Entertainment LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethawks Baseball LP
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Concessions & Catering LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAJ Baseball LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Fireflies LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boise Hospitality and Food Services LLC
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP
Represented By: John Briody
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Stephen M LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Rebecca Guiterman
Represented By: Robin Lynne Cohen
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Beach Pelicans LP doing business as Myrtle Beach Pelicans
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panhandle Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Amarillo Sod Poodles
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Emeralds Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Eugene Emeralds
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Baseball LLC doing business as West Virginia Power
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frisco Roughriders LP doing business as Frisco Roughriders
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jethawks Baseball LP doing business as Lancaster Jethawks
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chattanooga Professional Baseball LLC doing business as Chattanooga Lookouts
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho Falls Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as Idaho Falls Chukars
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inland Empire 66ers Baseball Club of San Bernardino Incorporated doing business as Inland Empire 66ers
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7th Inning Stretch LLC doing business as Stockton Ports
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Fireflies LLC doing business as Columbia Fireflies
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Antonio Missions Baseball Club Incorporated doing business as San Antonio Missions
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Wayne Professional Baseball LLC doing business as Fort Wayne TinCaps
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredericksburg Baseball LLC doing business as Fredericksburg Nationals
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Andrew L Sandler
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Stephen Michael LeBlanc
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Represented By: Jay R Sever
Represented By: Brian Andrew Cabianca
Represented By: Katie W Myers
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Saetrum
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Casualty Company
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Represented By: Jay R Sever
Represented By: Brian Andrew Cabianca
Represented By: Katie W Myers
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Saetrum
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: J Michael Hennigan
Represented By: Patrick Pijls
Represented By: Kurt M Zitzer
Represented By: Jay R Sever
Represented By: Brian Andrew Cabianca
Represented By: Katie W Myers
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Guiterman
Represented By: Gregory Thomas Saetrum
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Proffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?