Ulrich v. Kauer et al
Appellee: Alicia Marie Kauer and Clinton Jacob Kauer
Appellant: Dale D Ulrich
Case Number: 2:2020cv01328
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Appellees file a status report within seven (7) days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this action. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/1/20. (EJA)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Appellant's Excerpts Of The Record by Dale D Ulrich re: #5 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1 Voluntary Petition, #2 Exhibit Tab 2 Schedules & Statements, #3 Exhibit Tab 3 Amended Schedule C, #4 Exhibit Tab 4 Trustee's Objection To Exemptions, #5 Exhibit Tab 5 Debtors' Response, #6 Exhibit Tab 6 Trustee's Reply, #7 Exhibit Tab 7 Sur Reply, #8 Exhibit Tab 8 Motion To Strike, #9 Exhibit Tab 9 Order, #10 Exhibit Tab 10 Transcript)(Dake, Terry)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF by Dale D Ulrich. (Dake, Terry)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEAL AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within 14 days after the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief with the Clerk within 14 days after service of the appellant's brief. The appellant may serve and file a reply with the Clerk within 7 days after service of the appellee's brief. This action is designated an expedited track case. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/13/20. (DXD)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulrich v. Kauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alicia Marie Kauer
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clinton Jacob Kauer
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dale D Ulrich
Represented By: Terry A Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?