Berrow v. Navient Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Berrow
Defendant: Navient Solutions LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01342
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER pursuant to the Stipulated #14 Motion to Extend Motion to Strike Deadline Regarding Navient Solutions, LLC's Answer, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Motion to Strike Navient's Affirmative Defenses is extended to 9/15/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/26/2020. (ESG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike by Michael Berrow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCraw, Dawn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Michael Berrow. (McCraw, Dawn)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for September 18, 2020 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call by arranging for the presence of all other attorneys and self-represented parties, and by calling chambers at the scheduled time. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/04/2020. (ESG)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navient Solutions LLC. (Larsen, Brett)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Navient Solutions LLC.(Larsen, Brett)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett B Larsen on behalf of Navient Solutions LLC. (Larsen, Brett)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Michael Berrow: Proof of Service re: 1) Issued Summons 2)Complaint 3)Civil Cover Sheet 4)Notice of Availability 5) Order re Service 6) Order re Motions 7) Order re Courtesy Copies upon Navient Solutions, LLC on 07/10/2020. (McCraw, Dawn)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This Court adheres to Section D of the ECF Administrative Policies & Procedures Manual, specifically pages 8 & 9. Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/20. (MAW)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/20. (MAW)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, you must serve each Defendant in your case with the Summons and Complaint within 90 days from the date the Complaint is filed, unless you obtain a waiver of service pursuant to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 6, 2020 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 7/9/20. (MAW)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Navient Solutions LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Michael Berrow. (McCraw, Dawn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18454362. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01342-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18454362 filed by Michael Berrow. (submitted by Dawn McCraw) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrow v. Navient Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Berrow
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Represented By: Dawn Marie McCraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions LLC
Represented By: Brett B Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?