Barrera v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Megan Barrera
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv01344
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. That the Defendant's Motion (Doc. #9 ) is granted; and 2. That the Clerk of Court shall transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas and terminate this case in the District of Arizona. (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 9/2/20. (SLQ)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case //Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank's Reply In Support Of Motion To Transfer Venue To The Western District Of Texas filed by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Craiger, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Craiger, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Craiger, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #9 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case filed by Megan Barrera. (Findsen, Beth)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration by Megan Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chami, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action Pending Arbitration filed by Megan Barrera. (Chami, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 *MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Western District of Texas by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Craiger, John) *Modified to correct event on 8/6/2020 (GMP).
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay this Action Pending Arbitration by USAA Federal Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Craiger, John)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Megan Barrera: Affidavit of Service re: Issued Summons, Complaint, Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability upon USAA Federal Savings Bank on 07/24/2020. (Chami, David)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Megan Barrera: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon USAA Federal Savings Bank on 7/15/2020. (Chami, David) *Modified to correct service date on 7/21/2020 (WLP).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 6, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/8/2020. (LMR)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to USAA Federal Savings Bank. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18454759. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P. Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01344-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Megan Barrera. (submitted by David Chami) (REK)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18454759 filed by Megan Barrera. (submitted by David Chami) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrera v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Barrera
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: John Spencer Craiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?