Fowler v. T-Mobile USA Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: JaMarlin Fowler
Defendant: California, State of, Arizona, State of, T-Mobile USA Incorporated, Federal Communications Commission and Federal Trade Commission
Case Number: 2:2020cv01516
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until November 2, 2020 to file a response to Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #18 ). See document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/29/20. (EJA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by T-Mobile USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Michael W. Gray, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Certificate of Service)(Gray, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-Mobile USA Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US Incorporated, Deutsche Telekom AG and SoftBank Group Corporation for T-Mobile USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gray, Michael) *Modified to add corporate parties on 9/30/2020 (EJA).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until October 8, 2020 to file a response to Defendant State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #14 ). See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/23/20. (EJA)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Arizona, State of, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by California, State of. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Record)(Gaughan, Michael) *Modified to correct event type on 9/23/2020 (EJA).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until October 8, 2020 to file a response to Defendant State of California's Motion to Dismiss #12 . Defendant State of California shall file any reply within seven days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. The Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 9/22/2020. (REK)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by California, State of. (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
September 18, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendant California, State of. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 1, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael William Gray on behalf of Defendant T-Mobile USA Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (EJA)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arizona, State of, California, State of, Federal Communications Commission, Federal Trade Commission, T-Mobile USA Incorporated. (EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX221226. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01516-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (EJA)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by JaMarlin Fowler. (EJA)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by JaMarlin Fowler. (EJA)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX221226 filed by JaMarlin Fowler. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. T-Mobile USA Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California, State of
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Incorporated
Represented By: Michael William Gray
Represented By: Peter Ryan Montecuollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Communications Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JaMarlin Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?