Tsinginie v. Logan
Petitioner: Nelrick Lee Tsinginie
Respondent: Steven P Logan
Case Number: 2:2020cv01623
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Petitioner's Letter #5 is denied to the extent that any relief is sought therein. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/2/2020. (LMR)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Letter addressed to Judge Logan by Nelrick Lee Tsinginie. (SLQ) (4 pages, plus envelope).
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed August 26, 2020, Petitioner's Administrative Notice: Mandatory Judicial Notice In the Nature of [Petition for] Writ of Coram Non Judice [sic] is denied. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (LAD)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - (1) The Court declines to recuse from this case. (2) Petitioner's "Administrative Notice: Mandatory Judicial Notice In the Nature of [Petition for] Writ of Coram Non Judice [sic]" (Doc. #1 ) is denied and this case is dismissed without prejudice. (3) The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/25/2020. (LAD)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (LAD)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis filed by Nelrick Lee Tsinginie. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAD) (10 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsinginie v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven P Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelrick Lee Tsinginie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?