Romero v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Paulino Romero
Defendant: Daniel Thomas
Case Number: 2:2020cv01627
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall reply within the time set by the Civil Local Rules. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the portions of the August 28, 2020 Order requiring Plaintiff to serve and Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint are vacated because the parties have already accomplished these tasks. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 9/2/2020. (RMW)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - (1) Plaintiff must either serve Defendant or seek a waiver of service for Defendant. (2) If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant within 90 days of removal, the action may be dismissed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (3) Defendant must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (4) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/28/2020. (LAD)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Daniel Thomas. (Niederbaumer, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-008269. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18581501 filed by Daniel Thomas. (Niederbaumer, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Thomas
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Represented By: Sarah Roshanne Anchors
Represented By: Judith R Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulino Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?