Guevara et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo Guevara and Cathie Guevara
Defendant: LL Building Products Incorporated, Unknown Parties, GAF Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated and GAF Materials LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01629
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Cathie Guevara, Ricardo Guevara. (Krukowski, Katherine) *Modified to correct event on 10/16/2020 (DXD).
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Cathie Guevara, Ricardo Guevara. (Krukowski, Katherine)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving the #12 Stipulation without prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate Defendant GAF Corporation from this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/6/2020. (LFIG)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 *NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) filed by Ricardo Guevara, Cathie Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Krukowski, Katherine) *Modified to correct event on 10/8/2020 (DXD).
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Second Amended Complaint. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ricardo Guevara.(Krukowski, Katherine)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal TO DISMISS GAF CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Ricardo Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Krukowski, Katherine)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by GAF Corporation, GAF Materials LLC, LL Building Products Incorporated.(Turk, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated. (Collins, Jefferson)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER RE RULE 12(b)(6) by Ricardo Guevara . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Krukowski, Katherine)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Ricardo Guevara . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Krukowski, Katherine)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order upon any Defendants who have not yet appeared and shall file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/19/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/19/2020. (LFIG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18585769. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01629-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint re: #1 Notice of Removal by Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated. (submitted by Jefferson Collins) (REK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated. (submitted by Jefferson Collins) (REK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated. (submitted by Jefferson Collins) (REK)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-005998. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18585769 filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated. (submitted by Jefferson Collins) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Guevara
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Katherine Bool Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathie Guevara
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Katherine Bool Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL Building Products Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Borders Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Borders Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated
Represented By: Jefferson T Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAF Materials LLC
Represented By: Andrew Borders Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?