Canez #327270 v. Bowman et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Jesus Canez
Defendant: Unknown Bowman, Unknown Party and Unknown Dolezal
Case Number: 2:2020cv01633
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
2 Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS. USM 285 Summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to Defendants Bowman and Dolezal. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Subpoena by Benjamin Jesus Canez. (SLQ) (1 page).
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by Benjamin Jesus Canez. (SLQ) (1 page).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Status (Doc. #6 ) is granted to the extent this Order informs him of the present status of this case. Defendants Bowman and Dolezal must answer the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff this Order, and a copy of the Marshal's Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendants Bowman and Dolezal. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Plaintiff is granted 120 days from the filing date of this Order in which to discover by subpoena, or otherwise, the actual identity of the "COII Unknown Male," and to file a "notice of substitution" providing that Defendant's actual name. The Clerk of Court must issue a subpoena in blank and send it to Plaintiff. If Plaintiff fails to file a "notice of substitution" within 120 days from the filing date of this Order, the Clerk of Court must dismiss Defendant "COII Unknown Male" without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Service Packet Letter, #2 Samples and Blank Service Forms, #3 Blank Service Forms, #4 Copy of Rule 4, #5 Sample, Blank 285 Form and Blank Issued Subpoena)(LAD)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Status (titled Frivolous Motion) by Benjamin Jesus Canez (1 page). (DXD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (SST)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SST)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Benjamin Jesus Canez. (SST) (3 pages)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Benjamin Jesus Canez. (SST) (2 pages)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Benjamin Jesus Canez. (SST) (9 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canez #327270 v. Bowman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Jesus Canez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?