Keller v. E. Loan Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Madeline A Keller
Defendant: E. Loan Incorporated, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Unknown Party and Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01646
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER This matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed with prejudice within 45 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. All pending hearings and deadlines are vacated. All pending motions are found to be moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter on 11/23/2020 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/08/2020. (ESG)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by Madeline A Keller. (Bruemmer, Florence)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER pursuant to the #14 Stipulation to Extend deadline, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC's & Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation's #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/09/2020. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/22/2020. (ESG)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss by Madeline A Keller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruemmer, Florence)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gale, Jessica)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/09/2020. (ESG)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/09/2020. (ESG)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-1646-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation For Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC may have until September 11, 2020 to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (attached as Ex. A to Doc. #1 ) in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/26/20. (EJA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gale, Jessica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18592721. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01646-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
August 21, 2020 ***State Court record received on 8/21/2020***Service Returned Unexecuted by Madeline A Keller: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration as to E. Loans Servicing.***Declaration of Non-Service filed in State Court on 7/27/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/21/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 21, 2020 ***State Court record received on 8/21/2020***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Madeline A Keller: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Specialized Loan Servicing LLC on 7/23/2020.***Declaration of Service filed in State Court on 7/27/2020, docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/21/2020 for case management purposes.*** (REK) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (submitted by Jessica Gale) (REK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation. (submitted by Jessica Gale) (REK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054302. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18592721 filed by Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (submitted by Jessica Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. E. Loan Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Loan Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation
Represented By: David Edward Funkhouser, III
Represented By: Jessica Anne Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline A Keller
Represented By: Florence M Bruemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?