Deichmiller et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: David Deichmiller and Constance Sutton
Defendant: PHH Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Bankers Trust Company of California NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01669
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The parties' Stipulation to Extend Case Management Conference 19] is granted. The Case Management Conference presently set for October 30, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. is vacated and reset for December 1, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file their Joint Rule 26(f) Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Rule 16 Case Management Order no later than November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/22/2020. (LMR)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re: #13 Order, Set/Reset Hearings to Extend by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Loan Services. (Riether, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by David Deichmiller, Constance Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(DXD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Robert Anthony Riether. (Riether, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Loan Services. (Riether, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Petition for Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Loan Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Riether, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Deichmiller, Constance Sutton. (DXD)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Newell, Joel)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs David Deichmiller and Constance Sutton by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Loan Services.(Newell, Joel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Notice. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Service of Preliminary Order by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Loan Services re: #8 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Newell, Joel)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 8/26/2020. (LMR)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, PHH Loan Services. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal Amended/Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Newell, Joel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MCO)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Loan Services, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18602881. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1669-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Loan Services identifying Corporate Parent PHH Corporation, Corporate Parent Ocwen Mortgage Servicing Incorporated, Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Corporate Parent PHH Mortgage Corporation for PHH Loan Services. (Newell, Joel) (MCO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-054307. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18602881 filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, PHH Loan Services. (Newell, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deichmiller et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Deichmiller
Represented By: Mary T Hone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Sutton
Represented By: Mary T Hone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Loan Services
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Earp
Represented By: Joel Frederic Newell
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Earp
Represented By: Joel Frederic Newell
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Earp
Represented By: Joel Frederic Newell
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Trust Company of California NA
Represented By: Kimberly Sue Earp
Represented By: Joel Frederic Newell
Represented By: Robert Anthony Riether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?