Radix Law PLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Radix Law PLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01810
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation to extend time is granted (Doc. #10 ), and Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than November 16, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/9/20. (MAW)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Radix Law PLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, Robert)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 at 11:15AM before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Counsel are directed to call (866) 390-1828; Access code: 9667260. Counsel are advised that speaker phones are not permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radix Law PLC. (Frutkin, Jonathan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Company for JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified corporate party per party name standards on 10/26/2020 (REK).
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G)(Goodwin, Nicole) *Modified to correct motion type on 10/26/2020 (REK).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/22/20. (MAW)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint) by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodwin, Nicole)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Radix Law PLC. (REK)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18674343. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01810-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2020-054885. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18674343 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (submitted by Nicole Goodwin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radix Law PLC v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radix Law PLC
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Represented By: Robert Neil Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Represented By: Adrianna Griego Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?