Novastep SAS et al v. Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Plaintiff: Novastep SAS and Novastep Incorporated
Defendant: Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01862
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven M Coyle on behalf of Plaintiffs Novastep Incorporated, Novastep SAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 6, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Steven M Coyle removed as counsel for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novastep Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Amplitude SAS for Novastep Incorporated. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novastep SAS identifying Corporate Parent Amplitude SAS for Novastep SAS. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
September 30, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Nicholas A Geiger on behalf of Plaintiffs Novastep Incorporated, Novastep SAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 28, 2020. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/24/2020. (JAMA)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/24/2020. (JAMA)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fusion Orthopedics LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18697529. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J. Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01862-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Novastep Incorporated, Novastep SAS. (submitted by Kenneth Motolenich-Salas) (REK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Novastep Incorporated, Novastep SAS. (submitted by Kenneth Motolenich-Salas) (REK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18697529 filed by Novastep Incorporated, Novastep SAS. (submitted by Kenneth Motolenich-Salas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novastep SAS et al v. Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novastep SAS
Represented By: Steven M Coyle
Represented By: Nicholas A Geiger
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novastep Incorporated
Represented By: Steven M Coyle
Represented By: Nicholas A Geiger
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Orthopedics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?