Owens v. Shinn et al
Plaintiff: William Clifford Owens, IV
Defendant: Unknown Lopez, Unknown Ramirez, Trinity Corporation, Unknown Kidwell, Uknown Romo, Unknown Dovantes-Castillo, David Shinn and Unknown Venalonzo
Case Number: 2:2020cv01866
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's Request for Summons #9 is denied without prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/13/2020. (LMR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for service packet by William Clifford Owens, IV. (1 page) (WLP)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of William Clifford Owens, IV, inmate #095286. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/4/2020. (WLP)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #5 ) is granted. (2) As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $7.54. (3) The First Amended Complaint (Doc. #4 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. (4) If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. (5) The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Instructions and Civil Rights Complaint)(WLP)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Clifford Owens, IV. (SLQ) (2 pages).
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by William Clifford Owens, IV. (SLQ) (2 pages).
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Dovantes-Castillo, Unknown Kidwell, Unknown Lopez, Unknown Ramirez, Uknown Romo, David Shinn, Trinity Corporation, Unknown Venalonzo filed by William Clifford Owens, IV. (8 pages) (EJA)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas). (See Order for further details.) Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/9/20. (Attachments: #1 IFP) (SST)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (EJA)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by William Clifford Owens, IV. (8 pages) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Shinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Clifford Owens, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Romo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dovantes-Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Venalonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?