Strategic Funding Source Incorporated v. Bank 34
Not Classified By Court: Ace Funding Source, Maricopa County Treasurer, Arizona Department of Revenue, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Peter S Davis, Jennifer Wilkinson, KJB Supply Company Incorporated, Susquehanna Commercial Finance Incorporated, Layton Construction Company LLC and Clark Hill PLC
Trustee: Jill H Ford and United States Trustees Office
Appellant: Strategic Funding Source Incorporated Creditor doing business as Kapitus
Debtor: Wilkinson Floor Covering Incorporated
Appellee: Bank 34
Case Number: 2:2020cv01882
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation of Dismissal: This appeal is dismissed without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/20/20. (DXD)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Strategic Funding Source Incorporated. (Bauman, Nicholas)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Appellant shall serve and file an opening brief within 14 days after the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief within 14 days after service of the appellant's brief. The appellant may serve and file a reply within 7 days after service of the appellee's brief. This action is designated an expedited track case. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/8/20. (DXD)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank 34. (Corrales, Jody)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strategic Funding Source Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Strategic Funding Source Holdings LLC for Strategic Funding Source Incorporated. (Brown, Scott)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Ace Funding Source, Bank 34, Clark Hill PLC, KJB Supply Company Incorporated, Layton Construction Company LLC, Strategic Funding Source Incorporated, Susquehanna Commercial Finance Incorporated, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wilkinson Floor Covering Incorporated. (REK)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit, BAP No. AZ-20-1207 by Strategic Funding Source Incorporated. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strategic Funding Source Incorporated v. Bank 34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ace Funding Source
Represented By: Mark Alan Kirkorsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Maricopa County Treasurer
Represented By: Klaus Peter Muthig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Arizona Department of Revenue
Represented By: Matthew Allen Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: James B Ball
Represented By: James Edward Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter S Davis
Represented By: Ryan W Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jennifer Wilkinson
Represented By: James F Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: KJB Supply Company Incorporated
Represented By: London Ashley Burns
Represented By: Dean M Dinner
Represented By: Michael W Sillyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Susquehanna Commercial Finance Incorporated
Represented By: James B Ball
Represented By: James Edward Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Layton Construction Company LLC
Represented By: James Hendrik Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clark Hill PLC
Represented By: P Douglas Folk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jill H Ford
Represented By: Adam Bennett Nach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Represented By: Larry Lee Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Strategic Funding Source Incorporated Creditor doing business as Kapitus
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bauman
Represented By: Justin James Henderson
Represented By: Scott Kent Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Wilkinson Floor Covering Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas E Littler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank 34
Represented By: Jody Ann Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?