Santa Files Productions LLC et al v. Dabney et al
Plaintiff: Santa Files Productions LLC and Laundry Films Incorporated
Defendant: Jesse D Parks and Richard Dabney
Case Number: 2:2020cv01883
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting #12 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiffs' request for statutory damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 504(c) against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $30,000.00 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for statutory damages pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 1203(c) against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $5,000.00 is GRANTED. Reasonable attorney's fees may be awarded to the prevailing party as part of the costs. 17 U.S.C. 505. Accordingly, Plaintiffs request for attorney's fees pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 505 against Defendants, jointly and severally, in the amount of $4,653.50 is GRANTED. The recovery of full costs by or against a party may be awarded pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 505. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' request for taxable costs of $460 against Defendants, jointly and severally, pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 505 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for a permanent injunction against Defendants is GRANTED. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/19/2020. (LAD)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Richard Dabney and Jesse D. Parks by Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Declaration of Joshua Lee, #3 Declaration of Stephanie Kessner, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendants Richard Dabney and Jesse D. Parks. (LAD)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Entry of Default RULE 55(a) REQUEST FOR THE CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RICHARD DABNEY AND JESSE D. PARKS by Plaintiffs Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC against Richard Dabney and Jesse D. Parks. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed entry of default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Richard Dabney on 10/3/2020. (LAD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 * SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Jesse Parks on 10/3/2020. (LAD) * Modified to remove filer on 10/14/2020 (LAD).
September 29, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kerry Steven Culpepper on behalf of Plaintiffs Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Richard Dabney, Jesse D Parks. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (MCO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MCO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2020: #1 AO121, #2 AO121) (MCO).
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18714550. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-1883-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laundry Films Incorporated, Santa Files Productions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Pictures LLC for Santa Files Productions LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry) (MCO)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18714550 filed by Santa Files Productions LLC, Laundry Films Incorporated. (Culpepper, Kerry) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Declaration of Counsel, #8 Declaration of Arheidt, #9 Notice of Filing Copyright Action)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santa Files Productions LLC et al v. Dabney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse D Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Dabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Files Productions LLC
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laundry Films Incorporated
Represented By: Kerry Steven Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?