BJA Enterprises LLC v. Yuma, City of
Plaintiff: BJA Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Yuma, City of
Case Number: 2:2020cv01901
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Land Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the #9 Stipulation and an extension until February 9, 2021 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. ORDERED resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/9/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/9/2020. (LFIG)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Christopher Short on behalf of Yuma, City of. (Short, Rodney)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by BJA Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lutz, Stanley)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 1/5/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/28/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by BJA Enterprises LLC: Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Order and Corporate Statement upon City of Yuma on 10/19/2020. (Lutz, Stanley)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/30/2020. (LFIG)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Yuma, City of. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18724476. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-01901-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by BJA Enterprises LLC. (submitted by Stanley Lutz) (REK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BJA Enterprises LLC. (submitted by Stanley Lutz) (REK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18724476 filed by BJA Enterprises LLC. (submitted by Stanley Lutz) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BJA Enterprises LLC v. Yuma, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuma, City of
Represented By: Rodney Christopher Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BJA Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Stanley B Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?