MacKenzie v. Schreiber et al.
Appellant: ROBERT A MACKENZIE
Appellee: MARK CHRISTIAN SCHREIBER and DEBORAH JEAN SCHREIBER
Case Number: 2:2020cv01993
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - The appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed. The appellee shall serve and file a responsive brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellants brief; and the appellant may serve and file a reply with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the appellees brief, and if the appellee has cross-appealed, the appellee may file and serve a reply brief to the response of the appellant to the issues presented in the cross appeal within fourteen (14) days after service of the reply brief of the appellant. FURTHER, TAKE NOTICE that pursuant to LRCiv 16.2(b)(1)(A)(i) this action is designated an expedited track case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with provisions of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Appeal Procedure and this Order may result in the court taking action for failure to perfect the appeal, including possible dismissal pursuant to LRBankr 8020-1. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/9/2020. (LAD)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (LAD)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Clerk US Bankruptcy Court (Phx). (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacKenzie v. Schreiber et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT A MACKENZIE
Represented By: Terry A Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARK CHRISTIAN SCHREIBER
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DEBORAH JEAN SCHREIBER
Represented By: Kenneth Lynn Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?