Kraft v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Defendant: Arizona, State of, David B Gass, John R Lopez, IV, David W Garbarino, Douglas Gerlach, David D Weinzweig, Unknown Parties, Robert M Brutinel, James P Beene, William G Montgomery, Kent E Cattani and Michael Reagan
Case Number: 2:2020cv02004
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remove Order. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/14/2020. (CLB)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than January 14, 2021; 2. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and 3. That unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 14, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/14/2020. (CLB)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P. Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-2004-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO REMOVE ORDER FROM THE RECORD OF THE CASE re: #8 Order to Show Cause by Rune Kraft. (Kraft, Rune)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Rune Kraft shall show cause in writing on or before January 11, 2021, why Plaintiff should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff complies with Rule 3.7(b) on or before January 11, 2021, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/11/20. (SST)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 10/21/20. (NKS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX223183. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02004-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(SST)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Rune Kraft. (SST) (5 pages)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Rune Kraft. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (SST)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Equitable Relief, and to Recover Damages for Injury to Person and Property. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX223183 filed by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SST) (39 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Gass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Lopez, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Garbarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David D Weinzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M Brutinel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Beene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?