Holliday v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Lamain Holliday
Defendant: Centurion of Arizona LLC, Arizona, State of, Corizon Health Incorporated and Unknown Rivera
Case Number: 2:2020cv02026
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
2 Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Arizona, State of. (Howard, Zachary)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - A Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference is set for January 12, 2021 at 11:00 a.m., before the Honorable Judge Eileen S. Willett, United States Magistrate Judge. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to make arrangements for a call-in conference call. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/23/2020. (MHW)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #9 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Centurion of Arizona LLC.(McLaughlin, Jathan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant State of Arizona's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Arizona, State of.(Howard, Zachary)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Lamain Holliday . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broaddus, Jody)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lamain Holliday.(Broaddus, Jody)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - (1) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/23/2020. (LAD)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC)
October 21, 2020 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons; Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration; Complaint upon Centurion of Arizona LLC on 10/8/2020.SERVICE EXECUTED: Declaration of Service re: Summons; Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration; Complaint upon State of Arizona on 10/8/2020. (Originals filed in Yuma County Superior Court on 10/9/2020)(DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (McLaughlin, Jathan) (DLC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Yuma County Superior Court, case number S1400CV202000516. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18795951 filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (McLaughlin, Jathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet 2, #4 Exhibit)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holliday v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamain Holliday
Represented By: Jody Lynn Broaddus
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Jathan Paul McLaughlin
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Michelle Catherine Lombino
Represented By: Zachary Shawn Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?