United States of America v. $19,520.00 in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,520.00 in US Currency
Case Number: 2:2020cv02100
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Service by Publication. Last publication date December 4, 2020 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration, Notice, Advertisement Certification Report)(Wenker, Mark)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Proof of Service re: Notice of Forfeiture, verified Complaint for Forfeiture (Doc. #1 ), Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate Judge (Doc. #2 ), and Scheduling Order #3 upon Colin Green, Jon Wilkinson on November 5, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Wenker, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Arrest of Defendant by U.S. Marshals Service on 11/09/2020 by United States of America re: #4 Warrant Issued . (Wenker, Mark)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem issued. (REK)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Discovery due six (6) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. Dispositive motions due seven (7) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. If this matter is stayed pending related criminal proceedings, a written joint status report shall be due every six (6) months from the date of the Order to stay case. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/2/2020. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02100-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (submitted by Mark Wenker) (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $19,520.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,520.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark James Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?