Pso-Rite.com LLC v. Exerscribe Incorporated
Plaintiff: Pso-Rite.com LLC
Defendant: Exerscribe Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv02146
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 to February 3, 2021. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/22/2020. (CLB)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Exerscribe Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crum, Isaac)
December 11, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Vincent M Ferraro on behalf of Plaintiff Pso-Rite.com LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (First Request) (Doc. #14 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) to January 4, 2021. )(See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/3/2020. (JAMA)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Exerscribe Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crum, Isaac)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pso-Rite.com LLC: Declaration of Service re: Order Regarding Motions to Dismiss and Motions to Strike dated November 19, 2020 upon Exerscribe, Inc. on 11/20/20. (Klain, William)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/19/2020. (JAMA)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-20-2146-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 19, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael J Zinna, Tiffany Arosemena on behalf of Plaintiff Pso-Rite.com LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pso-Rite.com LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction (blank form), Corporate Disclosure Statement, AO 120 Reports upon Exerscribe, Inc. on 11/11/2020. (Klain, William)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Exerscribe Incorporated. (SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Pso-Rite.com LLC. (Klain, William) (SCA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (SCA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18861892. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S. Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02146-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Pso-Rite.com LLC. (Klain, William) (SCA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pso-Rite.com LLC. (Klain, William) (SCA)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18861892 filed by Pso-Rite.com LLC. (Klain, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pso-Rite.com LLC v. Exerscribe Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pso-Rite.com LLC
Represented By: Michael J Zinna
Represented By: George Hamilton King
Represented By: William George Klain
Represented By: Vincent M Ferraro
Represented By: Tiffany Arosemena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exerscribe Incorporated
Represented By: Isaac Scott Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?