VPR Brands LP v. Jupiter Research LLC
Plaintiff: VPR Brands LP
Defendant: Jupiter Research LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02185
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/21/2020. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by VPR Brands LP: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/19/2020 to Jupiter Research, LLC . (Rothman, Joel)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joel Benjamin Rothman on behalf of Plaintiff VPR Brands LP. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/16/2020. (LFIG)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by VPR Brands LP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - The following information must be stated upon the first page of every document and may be presented for filing single-space: The name, address, e-mail address, State Bar Attorney number, telephone number, and optionally the fax number, of the attorney appearing for the party in the action or proceeding and whether the attorney appears for the plaintiff, defendant, or other party - in propria persona - must be typewritten or printed in the space to the left of the center of the page and beginning at line one (1) on the first page. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jupiter Research LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18878020. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02185-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VPR Brands LP. (submitted by Joel Rothman) (REK)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by VPR Brands LP. (submitted by Joel Rothman) (REK)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by VPR Brands LP. (submitted by Joel Rothman) (REK)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18878020 filed by VPR Brands LP. (submitted by Joel Rothman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VPR Brands LP v. Jupiter Research LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jupiter Research LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VPR Brands LP
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?