Ingstrum v. Gilbert Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Diane M Ingstrum
Defendant: Gilbert Public Schools, Jay Morris and Tim Rosinke
Case Number: 2:2020cv02468
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. #7 ). (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/10/21. (SST)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Diane M Ingstrum. (SST) (1 page)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on March 24, 2021. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/29/20. (SST)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ). After consideration, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 12/29/20. (SST)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02468-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Diane M Ingstrum. (SST) (8 pages)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Diane M Ingstrum. (SST) (13 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingstrum v. Gilbert Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Rosinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane M Ingstrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?