Danam v. Arizona Board of Education
Plaintiff: Rafael Cezar Danam
Defendant: Arizona Board of Education, Jay Cryder, Calvin Baker, Claudio Coria, Janice Mak, Patricia Welborn, Rita H Cheng, Tim Carter, Bonnie Sneed, Diane Douglass, Michelle Kaye, Lucas J Narducci, Garnett Winder, Jared Taylor, Melissa Sadorf, Alicia Williams, Prudence Lee, Daniel P Corr, Chuck Schmidt and David W Spelich
Case Number: 2:2020cv02489
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER allowing Plaintiff to serve the summons and First Amended Complaint (Doc. #11 ) on Defendants. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiff's request to screen his amended complaint. (Doc. #12 .) The Court also denies Plaintiff's remaining requests in his motion. (Doc. #12 .) See order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 2/25/21. (NKS)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION CHAMBERS REVIEW CASE MANAGEMENT, INJUNCTIVE ORDERS AND INSTRUCTIONS REQUEST by Rafael Cezar Danam. (Danam, Rafael Cezar)
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rafael Cezar Danam.(Danam, Rafael Cezar)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED the Motion #8 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this case be reassigned, by lot, to another Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-20-02489-PHX-MTL. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/4/21. (SLQ)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/4/21. (SLQ)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Judicial Recusal Consideration by Rafael Cezar Danam. (4 pages) (WLP)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Rafael Cezar Danam. (WLP)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Rafael Cezar Danam. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (WLP)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed with leave to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. If Plaintiff elects to file an Amended Complaint, it may not be served until and unless the Court issues an Order screening the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/14/21. (DXD)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/4/21. (DXD)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-02489-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rafael Cezar Danam. (DXD)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rafael Cezar Danam.(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danam v. Arizona Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Cezar Danam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Cryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio Coria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Mak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita H Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas J Narducci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnett Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Sadorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudence Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel P Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Spelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?