TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated v. Cactus RV Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated
Defendant: Cactus RV Center LLC and Todd Barron Perry
Garnishee: Arizona Bank & Trust, JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, First Fidelity Bank and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2020mc00042
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Todd Barron Perry re: #15 Writ by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (DXD)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re: #11 Writ by First Fidelity Bank. (DXD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re: #12 , #13 Writs by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (DXD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re: #9 , #10 Writs of Garnishment by garnishee Arizona Bank & Trust. (DLC)
October 8, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment as to Cactus RV Center LLC re: #14 Writs of Garnishment by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (DXD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon First Fidelity Bank - Deer Valley on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon Arizona Bank & Trust on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Writ of Garnishment of Non-Earnings and Summons upon Arizona Bank & Trust on 09/30/2020. (Mitchell, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 Application for Writ. Documents not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Documents signed by attorney Zachary. R. Cormier but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Robert D. Mitchell. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #8 upon Wells Fargo Bank NA as to Todd Barron Perry. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #7 upon Wells Fargo Bank NA as to Cactus RV Center LLC. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #6 upon JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as to Todd Barron Perry. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #5 upon JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as to Cactus RV Center LLC. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #4 upon First Fidelity Bank as to Cactus RV Center LLC. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #3 upon Arizona Bank & Trust as to Todd Barron Perry. (SLQ)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 WRIT of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) issued re: #2 upon Arizona Bank & Trust as to Cactus RV Center LLC. (SLQ)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon Wells Fargo Bank NA as to Todd Barron Perry by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon Wells Fargo Bank NA as to Cactus RV Center LLC by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as to Todd Barron Perry by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as to Cactus RV Center LLC by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon First Fidelity Bank as to Cactus RV Center LLC by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon Arizona Bank & Trust as to Todd Barron Perry by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment and Summons (Non-Earnings) upon Arizona Bank & Trust as to Cactus RV Center LLC by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment and Summons)(Mitchell, Robert) *Modified text on 9/30/2020 (DXD).
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Registration of Foreign Judgments - 28 U.S.C. 1963. Case Opening Fee Received: $47.00 receipt number 0970-18611045 filed by TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated. (submitted by Robert Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated v. Cactus RV Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cactus RV Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barron Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance Incorporated
Represented By: Robert D Mitchell
Represented By: Zachary Robert Cormier
Represented By: Sarah Keturah Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Arizona Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: First Fidelity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?