Elise v. Arizona, State of
Plaintiff: Tracy Elise
Defendant: Arizona, State of, David Anthony Cutrer, Phoenix, City of, Edward Leiter, Annielaurie Van Wie, Maricopa, County of, James Gallagher, William Montgomery, Christopher Sammons and Rebekah Browder
Case Number: 2:2021cv00020
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle (PS)
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed February 18, 2021, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed for failure to state a claim. (REK)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Complaint #6 is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1), and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The docket shall reflect that the Court, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), has considered whether an appeal of this decision would be taken in good faith and certifies that an appeal would not be taken in good faith for the reasons states in the Order and because there is no arguable factual or legal basis for an appeal. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/18/2021. (REK)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Civil Liberties Violations against All Defendants filed by Tracy Elise.(Elise, Tracy)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 and Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by Party Appearing Without an Attorney #3 are granted. Plaintiff's "Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Brief" #1 is denied. Plaintiff has 30 days from the filing date of this Order to file a Complaint using the court-approved from included with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a Complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 1/13/2021. (REK)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Tracy Elise. (7 Page) (REK)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tracy Elise. (6 Pages) (REK)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (Titled: Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Brief) filed by Tracy Elise. (7 Pages) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elise v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Anthony Cutrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Leiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annielaurie Van Wie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Browder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Elise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?