Schultz v. Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC
Plaintiff: David Schultz
Defendant: Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC doing business as Chapman Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Case Number: 2:2021cv00051
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for April 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2021. (ESG)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2021. (ESG)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 2/24/2021. (ESG)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-0051-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC.(Ingold, Susanne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by David Schultz: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC on February 1, 2021. (Fabian, Veronika)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19052599. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00051-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (REM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by David Schultz.(Fabian, Veronika) (REM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19052599 filed by David Schultz.(Fabian, Veronika) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schultz v. Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Scottsdale Autoplex LLC doing business as Chapman Dodge Chrysler Jeep Ram
Represented By: Susanne Elizabeth Ingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schultz
Represented By: Hyung Sik Choi
Represented By: Veronika Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?