Su v. Wang
Plaintiff: Lihong Su
Defendant: Fuqiang Wang
Case Number: 2:2021cv00052
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lihong Su: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Order upon Defendant Fuqiang Wang on 02/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deadline to Serve (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff, by and through counsel, to serve the Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Fuqiang Wang by email with proof that recipient opens the email is extended to March 15, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/1/2021. (JAMA)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 EX PARTE First MOTION for Extension of Time - Motion to Extend Deadline to Serve by Lihong Su. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Alternative Service. Plaintiff, by and through her counsel, may serve the Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Fuqiang Wang by email with proof that recipient opens the email on or before the 3/1/21. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/11/21. (DXD)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 EX PARTE First MOTION For Alternative Service re: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Submitted - Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service - Expedited Consideration Requested by Lihong Su. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with the Summons and Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f) and file the affidavits of service with this Court. See order for details. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 1/20/21. (NKS)
January 20, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Timothy T Wang on behalf of Plaintiff Lihong Su. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/13/2021. (JAMA)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fuqiang Wang. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 *Summons Issued as to Fuqiang Wang. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to reflect incorrect PDF attached, correct PDF filed at doc #5 on 1/13/2021 (JAM).
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19053514. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-52-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lihong Su. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) (JAM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19053514 filed by Lihong Su. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Su v. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuqiang Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lihong Su
Represented By: Timothy T Wang
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?