Powell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Don Powell
Defendant: Rebecca L Jones and Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00054
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carol Clark appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Clark, Carol)
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons/First Amended Complaint/Order upon U.S. Attorney for the District of Arizona on 3/2/21. (SST)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 3/1/2021. (ESG)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #10 Order (Service Packet) by Marcus Don Powell. (SST) (1 page, titled "Motion to reconsider claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress/attempted murder")
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REVISED ORDER (Service Packet): IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is approved in part and dismissed in part. Plaintiff's claims for "intentional infliction of emotional distress/attempted murder" and "improper and invalid jurisdiction over a person" are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against ALJ Jones are dismissed with prejudice, and ALJ Jones is dismissed as a Defendant in this matter with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a Summons and provide it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 and copies of the First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) and this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete the U.S. Marshal Form 285 and return it along with the Summons and the Court-provided copies of the First Amended Complaint and this Order to the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the First Amended Complaint and Summons on Defendant as designated by Plaintiff on the completed U.S. Marshal Form 285. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/4/21. (SST)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (Service Packet): IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is approved in part and dismissed in part. Plaintiff's claims for "intentional infliction of emotional distress/attempted murder" and "improper and invalid jurisdiction over a person" are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against ALJ Jones are dismissed with prejudice, and ALJ Jones is dismissed as a Defendant in this matter with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a Summons and provide it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 and certified copies of the First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) and this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete the U.S. Marshal Form 285 and return it along with the Summons and the Court-provided copies of the First Amended Complaint and this Order to the Clerk of Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the First Amended Complaint and Summons on Defendant as designated by Plaintiff on the completed U.S. Marshal Form 285. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/4/21. (SST)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Marcus Don Powell. (SST) (7 pages)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Marcus Don Powell. (SST) (6 pages)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed with leave to file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ALJ Jones is dismissed as a Defendant in this matter with prejudice; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further order of this Court; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, it may not be served until and unless the Court issues an Order screening the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2).. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/19/2021. (ESG)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the #2 application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is granted. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 1/15/2021. (ESG)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00054-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marcus Don Powell. (SST) (5 pages)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marcus Don Powell. (SST) (5 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Carol Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Don Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?