Jackson v. Phoenix, City of et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Jackson
Defendant: Cody J Baker, Phoenix, City of and Tyler Luna
Case Number: 2:2021cv00221
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan M Brnovich
2 Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aaron Jackson: Return of Service re: complaint, summons upon Cody Baker on 3-12-21. (Tate, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for May 25, 2021 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 303, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2118. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/11/2021. (WLP)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Cody J Baker, Tyler Luna, Phoenix, City of. (Hyde, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cody J Baker, Tyler Luna, Phoenix, City of.(Hyde, Robert)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aaron Jackson: Return of Service re: complaint, summons upon City of Phoenix on 02-11-21. (Tate, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aaron Jackson: Return of Service re: complaint, summons upon Tyler Luna on 02-21-21. (Tate, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cody J Baker, Tyler Luna, Phoenix, City of. (SLQ). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff must either serve each Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each Defendant. (2) If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). (3) Defendants must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (4) Any answer or response must state the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. The Court may strike any answer, response, or other motion or paper that does not identify the specific Defendant by name on whose behalf it is filed. (5) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (6) This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (7) If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc. #2 . Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/10/21. (SLQ)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Aaron Jackson. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19145276 filed by Aaron Jackson. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Jackson
Represented By: Elizabeth Diane Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody J Baker
Represented By: Robert Aloysius Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Robert Aloysius Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Luna
Represented By: Robert Aloysius Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?