Myers v. Shepherd et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth James Myers
Defendant: Justin Solberg, Penni Padgett, Gila, County of and J Adam Shepherd
Case Number: 2:2021cv00229
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE re: #5 , #8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth James Myers (1 page). (DXD)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth James Myers (4 pages). (DXD)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth James Myers (2 pages). (DXD)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Penni Padgett, J Adam Shepherd, Justin Solberg filed by Kenneth James Myers (21 pages).(DXD)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth James Myers (3 pages). (DXD)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Kenneth James Myers (2 pages). (DXD)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 **AMENDED by Doc. #4 ** NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD) Modified on 2/17/2021 (DXD).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (Severed from CV-21-00212-PHX-JAT(CDB)) - This case is severed into individual actions, one for each named Plaintiff. The Clerk shall assign a new case number to each new individual action and file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) and this Order in each new case. The rulings in this Order shall apply in each new case. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, each Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed without prejudice with 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. The Clerk shall use the Gila County Jail address as the mailing address for each Plaintiff when mailing a copy of this Order and the case-opening paperwork in the new actions. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/21. (DXD)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (Severed from CV-21-00212-PHX-JAT(CDB)) filed by Kenneth James Myers (68 pages).(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Shepherd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penni Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Adam Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth James Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?