Martinez v. Shepherd et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Martinez
Defendant: Justin Solberg, Gila, County of, J Adam Shepherd and Penni Padgett
Case Number: 2:2021cv00259
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Referring Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Raymond Martinez. Reason for return: No longer in custody. Document number #5 . (DXD)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/12/2021. (REK)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Penni Padgett, J Adam Shepherd, Justin Solberg filed by Raymond Martinez. (6 Pages) (REK)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DXD)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER (Severed from CV-21-00212-PHX-JAT(CDB)) - This case is severed into individual actions, one for each named Plaintiff. The Clerk shall assign a new case number to each new individual action and file a copy of the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) and this Order in each new case. The rulings in this Order shall apply in each new case. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, each Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $52.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed without prejudice with 30 days leave to file an amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal without prejudice and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot if Plaintiff fails to comply. The Clerk shall use the Gila County Jail address as the mailing address for each Plaintiff when mailing a copy of this Order and the case-opening paperwork in the new actions. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/16/21. (DXD)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (Severed from CV-21-00212-PHX-JAT(CDB)) filed by Raymond Martinez (68 pages).(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Shepherd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Solberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gila, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Adam Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penni Padgett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?